CA AB2771 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 108981, 108981.5, and 108982 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Cosmetic products: safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2771 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2771 Friedman et al. By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2771 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2771 Friedman et al. By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2771 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 7.). |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.) |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4944.). |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 13.) |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108981 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 108981.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 108982 | New Code | See Bill Text |