CA AB2768 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.90 and 23690 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income and corporation taxes: credit: donation of food.
Sponsors
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23690 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |