CA AB2764 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6140, 6140.35, and 6140.36 of, to add Sections 6001.2 and 6001.4 to, and to add and repeal Section 6140.01 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to the State Bar Act.
Title
The State Bar Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Julia Brownley [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2764 Judiciary Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FEUER (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2764 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2764 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2764 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2764 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-16 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 6866.) (Corrected September 13.) | |
2010-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4974.) | |
2010-08-25 | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 5152.) | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-10 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2010-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |