CA AB2761 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 802, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 802, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10008 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Deaths while in law enforcement custody: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2761 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2761 McCarty By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2761 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2761 McCarty By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2761 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 802, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 8.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5197.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 9.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 19). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 10008 | New Code | See Bill Text |