CA AB2757 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4128, 4128.4, and 4128.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Centralized hospital packaging pharmacies: medication labels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2757 REV.& TAX. Assembly Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2757 REV.& TAX. Assembly Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5195.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 24. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4128.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4128.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60505.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |