CA AB2756 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 33190 of the Education Code, relating to private schools.
Title
Private schools: home schools: filing.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13143 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13146.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2756 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2756 |