CA AB2753 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 14 (commencing with Section 930) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Communications: Digital Equity Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 930 | New Code | See Bill Text |