CA AB2751 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11548.5 to the Government Code, relating to communications.
Title
Affordable Internet and Net Equality Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-14-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2751 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2751 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U. & C. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 4949.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11548.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |