CA AB275 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1000, 1090, 35012, 35120, and 47604.2 of the Education Code, relating to school governance.
Title
School governance: governing boards: pupil members: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 275 Ward Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB275 Ward et al. By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - AB 275 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB275 Ward et al. By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - AB 275 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3016.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2352.). |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1076.) |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 1090 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 35012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 35120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47604.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |