CA AB2746 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12419.10 and 68645.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 1803.3, 4760.1, 11104, 11104.3, 11206, 12814.5, 12814.6, 14910, 14911, 40000.11, 40508.6, 41500, and 41610 of, to amend and repeal Sections 13365 and 13365.2 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12807, 12808, and 13364 of, to add Section 40000.10 to, and to repeal Sections 40509 and 40509.5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Driving privilege: suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2746 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2746 Friedman et al. By Kamlager (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2746 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2746 Friedman et al. By Kamlager (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2746 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5183.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 20. Page 5004.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12419.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68645.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11104.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12808 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12814.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12814.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13365 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13365.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 1803.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40000.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40508.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 41500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 41610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4760.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |