CA AB2743 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11580.24 of, and to add Section 11580.241 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: personal vehicle sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2743 Pacheco Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2743 Pacheco By Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2743 Pacheco Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2743 Pacheco By Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2743 Pacheco Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5160.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11580.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11580.241 | New Code | See Bill Text |