CA AB2740 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9810, 9812.5, 9830.5, 9832.5, 9847.5, 9849, 9851, 9853, 9855.9, 9860, 9862.5, 9863, and 9873 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to consumer affairs.
Title
Bureau of Electronic and Appliance Repair, Home
Sponsors
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2740 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2740 Bonilla By Lieu (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2740 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2740 Bonilla By Lieu (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2740 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6359.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4705.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4852.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9812.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9830.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9832.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9847.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9855.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9860 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9862.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9863 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |