CA AB2739 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 24045.75 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control: special on-sale general license: for-profit theater.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2739 Chiu By Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2739 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2739 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4965.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 24045.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |