CA AB2736 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19605.74 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: Breeders’ Cup World Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2736 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2736 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5036.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19605.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |