CA AB2735 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 416, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 416, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 830.1 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: deputy sheriffs.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2735 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2735 Gray Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2735 Gray Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 416, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4982.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4369.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 830.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |