CA AB2724 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3007.06 to the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: driver’s licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3007.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |