CA AB2724 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 399.22 to, and to add and repeal Section 2853 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Renewable energy resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2724 BLUMENFIELD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2724 Blumenfield By Dutton (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2724 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2724 Blumenfield By Dutton (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2724 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6596.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4779.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-09 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5493.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4712.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4712.) | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |
2010-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |