CA AB2712 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8 of the Orange County Water District Act (Chapter 924 of the Statutes of 1933), relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials: Orange County Water District: groundwater remediation.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Asm. Donald Wagner [R] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2712 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2712 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5197.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4575.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.) |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25268.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |