CA AB2704 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14633 to the Government Code, relating to the State Capitol.
Title
State Capitol: Mervyn Dymally bust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2704 Gipson By Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2704 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2704 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5241.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14633 | New Code | See Bill Text |