CA AB2692 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89521.5 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: expenditures.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2692 Fong By Jackson (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2692 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2692 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4498.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4998.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 89521.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |