CA AB2685 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 508, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13963 of the Government Code, to amend Section 1191.15 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 216 and 9202 of the Probate Code, relating to crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2685 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2685 Cooley By Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2685 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 508, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6479.).
2014-08-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4808.).
2014-08-12SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-11SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
2014-06-24SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-06-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5165.)
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
2014-05-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2014-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2014-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2014-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2014-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13963Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1191.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code216Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code9202Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2685&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20140507_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20140812_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20140829_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20140920_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20140429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20140514_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20140527_0116PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20140617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20140825_0200PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20140826_0541PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback