CA AB2685 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44237 of the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Charter schools: criminal background of employees and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2685 De La Torre (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Assembly - AB 2685 DE LA TORRE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Assembly - AB 2685 DE LA TORRE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-09 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m. | |
2010-08-05 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-05 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4372.) | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-24 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5281.) | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-19 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). | |
2010-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |