CA AB2673 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1748, 1749, 1751.5, 1751.70, 1753, and 1755 of, and to add Sections 1752.1 and 1753.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospice agencies.
Title
Hospice agency licensure: moratorium on new licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2673 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB2673 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2673 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB2673 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2673 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5366.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4866.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1748 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1749 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1751.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1751.70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1752.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1753 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1753.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1755 | Amended Code | Citation Text |