CA AB2669 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18975 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to youth service organizations, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Youth service organizations: child abuse and neglect prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2669 Nazarian Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2669 Nazarian By Kamlager Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2669 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2669 Nazarian By Kamlager Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2669 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4908.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4611.) |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4502.) |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 18975 | Amended Code | Citation Text |