CA AB2657 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69957 of the Government Code, relating to court reporting.
Title
Electronic court reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2657 Charles Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2657 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2657 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-07-06 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-07-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4318.). | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69957 | Amended Code | Citation Text |