CA AB2657 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34601 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: pickup trucks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |