CA AB2653 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65400 and 65585 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and Zoning Law: housing elements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2653 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2653 Santiago et al. By Durazo (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2653 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2653 Santiago et al. By Durazo (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2653 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5222.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 19.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |