CA AB2650 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16642 of, and to add Section 7513.76 to, the Government Code, relating to public employee retirement systems.
Title
Public employee retirement systems: prohibited investments: Turkey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16642 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7513.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7513.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |