CA AB2635 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 104664 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: food access.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] |
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2635 Committee On AGRI.(Dodd) By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2635 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2635 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5113.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4687.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |