CA AB2620 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1939.23 of, and to add Section 1939.22 to, the Civil Code, relating to rental passenger vehicle transactions.
Title
Rental passenger vehicle transactions.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2620 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB2620 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2620 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB2620 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2620 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6666.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.). |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5006.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1939.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1939.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 10500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 10855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |