CA AB2619 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2827 and 2827.1 of, and to add Section 2827.2 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Net energy metering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |