CA AB2600 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13202.51 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: driving privilege: marijuana.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Norby [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 13202.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |