CA AB2597 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11713.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2597 Bill Berryhill Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2597 Bill Berryhill (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2597 BERRYHILL, B. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2597 Bill Berryhill (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2597 BERRYHILL, B. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-13 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6877.) | |
2010-08-26 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 4937.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-06-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-03 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5549.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 5576.) | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5447.). | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-19 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 19). | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |