CA AB2588 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2802.1 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational programs and training: costs: employees and applicants providing direct patient care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2588 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2588 Kalra By Gonzalez (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2588 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 17).
2020-08-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code2802.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback