CA AB2588 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1781 of the Civil Code, and to add Section 383 to, and to repeal and add Section 382 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Joinder: representative actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-04-27 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |