CA AB2564 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13305 of the Government Code, relating to state finance.
Title
State Budget: tax expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-16 - Assembly - AB 2564 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2564 Swanson By Wolk (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 2564 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2564 Swanson By Wolk (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 2564 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-16 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6214.) | |
2010-08-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 4405.) | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-04-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4933.) | |
2010-04-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |