CA AB2560 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12001.6 to the Education Code, relating to education finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: federal tax credit bond volume cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2560 BROWNLEY Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2560 Brownley Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2560 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2560 Brownley Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2560 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6662.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4839.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5161.) | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |