CA AB2555 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26069 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2555 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5032.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback