CA AB2550 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 174, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2644 to the Penal Code, relating to prisons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons: female inmates and male correctional officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2550 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2550 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2550 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 174, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06SenateSenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6139.).
2018-07-03SenateIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5040.).
2018-06-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2644New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code3327New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback