CA AB2547 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1370.01 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: competence to stand trial.
Sponsors
Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1370.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |