CA AB2543 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 459.5 and 461 of, and to add Section 459.6 to, the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Theft and burglary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 459.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 459.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |