CA AB2532 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Bill Berryhill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Bill Berryhill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1793.22 and 1793.23 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer warranties.
Title
Consumer warranties: Automotive Consumer Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Bill Berryhill. | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2010-04-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |