CA AB2531 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65940.1 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing data: collection and reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65940.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |