CA AB2526 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 873, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 873, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18140 and 18145 of the Penal Code, relating to restraining orders.
Title
Temporary emergency gun violence restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2526 Rubio By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2526 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2526 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 873, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5347.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5005.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 18140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |