CA AB2523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the heading of Chapter 5.6 (commencing with Section 11545) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to add Section 11547.5 to, the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Department of Technology.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2523 COOLEY Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2523 Cooley Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2523 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2523 Cooley Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2523 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6364.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4723.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5281.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11547.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11548.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |