CA AB2516 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 543, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6429 of the Water Code, relating to dams and reservoirs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dams: reservoir restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2516 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2516 Eggman et al. By Nielsen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2516 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 543, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6723.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5513.).
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13).
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4900.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code6429Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback