CA AB2513 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.2 (commencing with Section 108530) to Chapter 5 of Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to gas stoves.
Title
Gas stoves and ranges: warning label.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108530 | New Code | See Bill Text |