CA AB2512 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10700, 10702 and 10703 of, and to amend and renumber the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 10730) of Part 6 of Division 10 of, and to repeal Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 10720) of Part 6 of Division 10 of, the Elections Code, and to amend Section 1773 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
United States Senate vacancy.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 10700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10720 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1773 | Amended Code | Citation Text |