CA AB2503 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to tenancy.
Title
Landlords and tenants: California Law Revision Commission: study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2503 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2503 Cristina Garcia et a By Min (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2503 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2503 Cristina Garcia et a By Min (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2503 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 10.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5099.). |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 4881.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 3). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1939.99 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |