CA AB2499 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 35559 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Size, Weight, and Load: United States Army Heavy Equipment Transporter: exception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 35559 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2499 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2499 |